Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 236 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 236 Week
» 17572 Month
» 295368 Year
» 1179749 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1027 m/e 02/1910
BR 31027 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class P
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1910
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/03/1961
Service Life 51 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
DOV Dover Marine 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71A Eastleigh 4w/e 19/03/1952
71D Fratton 9w/e 30/06/1952
74C Dover Marine 8w/e 20/07/1953
   Withdrawn w/e 25/03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 21/01/1952
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 8w/e 19/03/1952
TOSTORE 71D Fratton m/e 30/06/1952
TOSTORE 74A Ashford 9w/e 11/12/1952
REINS 74C Dover Marine 6w/e 20/07/1953
WDN   w/e 25/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1910 To Service To service as SR Number 1027
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Dover (DOV)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31027    
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
30/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (71D)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31027    

prev