Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1201 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19004 Week
» 72020 Month
» 191547 Year
» 3218400 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1033 |
m/e |
10/1900 |
British Railways |
31033 |
m/e |
02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 10/1900 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/03/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
10/1900 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
73G |
|
|
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
70A |
|
Nine Elms |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
70B |
|
Feltham |
5w/e |
18/07/1959 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
19/03/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
14/06/1959 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
5w/e |
18/07/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/03/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1900 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1033 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31033 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
03/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
19/03/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31033 |
|
|