Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 2678 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16084 Week
» 69100 Month
» 188627 Year
» 3215480 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1054 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
British Railways |
31054 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 20/08/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
74B |
Ramsgate |
8w/e |
03/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
73C |
Hither Green |
3w/e |
27/03/1953 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
14/06/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
20/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1054 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31054 |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B) |
|
|
27/03/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
18/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
20/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31054 |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|