Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 305 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 305 Week
» 16284 Month
» 211738 Year
» 1096119 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1063 m/e 07/1900
BR 31063 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1900
Withdrawal During 04/1956
Scrapping During 04/1956
Service Life 55 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TON Tonbridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 7w/e 27/06/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 04/1956

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 27/06/1951
WDN   w/e 24/03/1956

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1063
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31063    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
04/1956 Withdrawn Condemned as 31063    

prev prev