Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 3667 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17073 Week
» 70089 Month
» 189616 Year
» 3216469 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1090 |
m/e |
01/1903 |
British Railways |
31090 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 01/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/08/1953 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 7 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1953 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
GFD |
Guildford |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
ALLOC |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/08/1953 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. |
SLS/194704 |
14/05/1948 |
General |
Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. |
SLS/194806 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1090 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (GFD) |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31090 |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
08/08/1953 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31090 |
|
|
10/1953 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|