Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 95 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4887 Week
» 14821 Month
» 47210 Year
» 931591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1112   09/1900
BR 31112   11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 05/05/1962
Scrapping During 05/1962
Service Life 61 yrs, 8 mths , 4 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GIL Gillingham (Kent) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 06/10/1951
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73H Dover Marine 4w/e 19/08/1959
73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 05/05/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 5w/e 08/10/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine 5w/e 19/08/1959
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 05/05/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1112
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31112    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
19/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (73H)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
05/05/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31112    

prev prev