Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 112 Today
» 909 Yesterday
» 112 Week
» 21953 Month
» 217407 Year
» 1101788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1113 m/e 03/1902
BR 31113 m/e 02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 15/07/1961
Scrapping During 08/1961
Service Life 59 yrs, 4 mths , 16 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HIT Hither Green 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
70B Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 15/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 15/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1902 To Service To service as SR Number 1113
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31113    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31113    

prev prev