Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 465 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2952 Week
» 15465 Month
» 103657 Year
» 988038 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1150   11/1902
BR 31150   01/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal During 10/1961
Scrapping During 11/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TON Tonbridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C Dover Marine 7w/e 27/06/1951
70B Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 9w/e 01/03/1948
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 21/10/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as SR Number 1150
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
01/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 31150    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
10/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31150    

prev prev