Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3954 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17360 Week
» 70376 Month
» 189903 Year
» 3216756 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1162 |
m/e |
03/1909 |
British Railways |
31162 |
m/e |
12/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1909 |
Withdrawal |
During 07/1961 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
03/1953 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. |
SLS/194704 |
28/07/1961 |
Ashford Works (Works Yard) |
Erecting Shop: 31263, 31621/5, 31804/33/58, 31905/12, 33011/16, 80038 ; being cut up-31575, 32563. Works Yard: 30904/14/29/33/8, 31162, 31247/56, 31507, 31720/59/80, also 30932/9 and 32410/565; |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1162 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
12/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31162 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
03/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
06/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
13/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E) |
|
|
26/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F) |
|
|
03/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
07/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31162 |
|
|