Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 801 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5402 Week
» 16949 Month
» 416631 Year
» 493218 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1178   02/1910
BR 31178   05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class P
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1910
Withdrawal During 06/1958
Service Life 48 yrs , 4 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BTN Brighton 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74C Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951
73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 08/10/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 74C Dover Marine 7w/e 21/01/1952
REINS 74C Dover Marine m/e 30/06/1952
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane q/e 08/10/1957
WDN   w/e 07/06/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1910 To Service To service as SR Number 1178
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Brighton (BTN)    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (74C)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 31178    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
06/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 31178    

prev prev