Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3421 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16827 Week
» 69843 Month
» 189370 Year
» 3216223 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1223 |
m/e |
03/1901 |
British Railways |
31223 |
m/e |
11/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1901 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 14/05/1960 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 2 mths , 15 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
74A |
Ashford |
6w/e |
08/02/1954 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
14/05/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1901 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1223 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
11/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31223 |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
14/05/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31223 |
|
|