Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1227   12/1900
BR 31227   08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 12/1900
Withdrawal During 10/1959
Scrapping During 11/1959
Service Life 58 yrs , 10 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
TON Tonbridge 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 24/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1227
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31227    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31227    

prev prev