Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 144 Today
» 853 Yesterday
» 4385 Week
» 17418 Month
» 239819 Year
» 1124200 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1234 m/e 04/1901
BR 31234 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1901
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/08/1953
Scrapping During y/e 1953
Service Life 52 yrs, 4 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GIL Gillingham (Kent) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 08/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane 5w/e 04/02/1950
WDN   w/e 08/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1901 To Service To service as SR Number 1234
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31234    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 31234    

prev prev