Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3521 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16927 Week
» 69943 Month
» 189470 Year
» 3216323 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1239 |
m/e |
11/1909 |
British Railways |
31239 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 11/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/01/1960 |
Service Life |
50 yrs, 2 mths , 9 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1960 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
11/1909 |
AFD |
|
Ashford |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
74D |
|
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/01/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
26/05/1953 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1239 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31239 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
01/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/01/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31239 |
|
|