Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 2863 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16269 Week
» 69285 Month
» 188812 Year
» 3215665 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1242 |
m/e |
04/1902 |
British Railways |
31242 |
m/e |
07/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 04/1902 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 30/09/1961 |
Service Life |
59 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1902 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1242 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
07/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31242 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
08/02/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B) |
|
|
19/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
21/06/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
14/06/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
09/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
30/09/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31242 |
|
|