Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 301 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 301 Week
» 16280 Month
» 211734 Year
» 1096115 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1242 m/e 04/1902
BR 31242 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 04/1902
Withdrawal w/e Sat 30/09/1961
Scrapping During 09/1961
Service Life 59 yrs, 5 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FAV Faversham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 08/02/1954
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 19/03/1954
73E Faversham 6w/e 21/06/1955
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 30/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 19/03/1954
ALLOC 73E Faversham 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1902 To Service To service as SR Number 1242
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31242    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
19/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31242    

prev prev