Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1253   01/1903
BR 31253   05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1903
Withdrawal During 10/1959
Scrapping During 12/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HIT Hither Green 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
73E Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951
70C Guildford 4w/e 11/12/1954
73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 20/04/1955
73C Hither Green 7w/e 08/10/1957
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green m/e 30/11/1946
ALLOC BA Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 04/02/1950
LOAN 73E Faversham 12/05/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 11/12/1954
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/04/1955
ALLOC 73C Hither Green q/e 08/10/1957
WDN   w/e 17/10/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 1253
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31253    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
11/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
20/04/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
10/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31253    

prev prev