Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3423 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16829 Week
» 69845 Month
» 189372 Year
» 3216225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1253 |
m/e |
01/1903 |
British Railways |
31253 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 01/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 17/10/1959 |
Service Life |
56 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1959 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1253 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31253 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
27/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
20/04/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31253 |
|
|
12/1959 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|