Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1256 m/e 06/1900
BR 31256 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1900
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/07/1961
Scrapping During 08/1961
Service Life 61 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GIL Gillingham (Kent) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951
73F Ashford 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 29/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 73E Faversham 12/05/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 73F Ashford P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 29/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1900 To Service To service as SR Number 1256
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31256    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31256    

prev prev