Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1260   08/1904
BR 31260   08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1904
Withdrawal During 05/1953
Scrapping During y/e 1953
Service Life 48 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FAV Faversham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D Tonbridge 4w/e 27/07/1951
73E Faversham 4w/e 06/10/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC AFD Ashford 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 4w/e 27/07/1951
ALLOC 73E Faversham 5w/e 08/10/1951
WDN   w/e 11/04/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 1260
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31260    
27/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
06/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
05/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 31260    

prev prev