Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 349 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 349 Week
» 17685 Month
» 295481 Year
» 1179862 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1263 m/e 05/1905
BR 31263 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class H
Company History SR
Wheels 0-4-4T
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1905
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/01/1964
Service Life 58 yrs, 8 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
75B Redhill 3w/e 09/05/1955
74A Ashford 6w/e 15/06/1956
73J Tonbridge 4w/e 05/04/1960
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 01/02/1962
75E Three Bridges 5w/e 02/07/1962
75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 05/01/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE UNK   10w/e 07/10/1952
ALLOC 75B Redhill 3w/e 09/05/1955
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 05/04/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 01/02/1962
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 25/06/1962
ALLOC 75F Tunbridge Wells West 4w/e 24/09/1962
ALLOC 75E Three Bridges 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 05/01/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/04/1960 Push and Pull Fitted

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1905 To Service To service as SR Number 1263
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31263    
09/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (74A)    
05/04/1960 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
05/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
01/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
02/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
24/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Tunbridge Wells West (75F)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Three Bridges (75E)    
01/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31263    

prev prev