Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 3676 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17719 Week
» 82673 Month
» 285337 Year
» 3312190 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1265 |
m/e |
05/1905 |
British Railways |
31265 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
H |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-4T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 05/1905 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/08/1960 |
Service Life |
55 yrs, 3 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
m/e |
30/11/1946 |
TOSTORE |
74B |
Ramsgate |
m/e |
31/08/1950 |
TOSTORE |
UNK |
|
10w/e |
07/10/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering works during February included: 1041, 1066. 1090, 1158, 1162, 1234, 1265, 1337, 1430, 1481, 1558, 2306, 2309, 2357, 2384, 2405, 2407, 2408, 2465, 2524, 2538, and 2589. |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1905 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1265 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ramsgate (RAM) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31265 |
|
|
08/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
06/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31265 |
|
|
09/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|