Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 80 Today
» 806 Yesterday
» 886 Week
» 19207 Month
» 107399 Year
» 991780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1270 m/e 06/1904
BR 31270 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1904
Withdrawal During 06/1959
Scrapping During 06/1959
Service Life 55 yrs

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HIT Hither Green 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D Tonbridge 4w/e 12/05/1951
   Withdrawn m/e 06/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HIT Hither Green m/e 30/11/1946
WDN   w/e 20/06/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 1270
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31270    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
06/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31270    

prev prev