|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
03/04/1947 | Ashford Works | During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. | SLS/194705 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1906 | To Service | To service as Southern Railway Number 1273 Built at Ashford Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Horsham (HOR) | ||
02/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Horsham (HOR) | ||
01/06/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Redhill (RED) | ||
13/11/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (BA) | ||
30/06/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Faversham (FAV) | ||
10/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 31273 | ||
12/1951 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 31273 | ||
12/1951 | Scrapped | Scrapped |