Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 595 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14001 Week
» 67017 Month
» 186544 Year
» 3213397 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1277 |
m/e |
02/1904 |
British Railways |
31277 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 02/1904 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1955 |
Service Life |
51 yrs , 7 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1904 |
BA |
|
Bricklayers Arms |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
TON |
|
Tonbridge |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
09/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/08/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/03/1953 |
Southern Miscellany |
S.E.C.R. engines lately moved to other Sections of the S.R. were 'L' 4-4-0s: 31762, 31766, to Guildford, and 'C' 0-6-0, 31277 to Brighton. The Canterbury and Whitstable line was reopened for coal traffic to Whitstable Harbour after the emergency closing of the main line there in February. More Wainwright 'H' 0-4-4Ts are being fitted for motor working. They are replacing the last remaining 'D3' Brighton bogie tanks on the Bexhill (West) and Hastings-Rye services, also appearing on other duties including some on the Central Division. Drummond 0-4-4T No. 30048 worked from Brighton to Seaford and back during early morning steam working of local services on account of engineering work. These L.S.W.R. 'M7s' come often to Brighton from Horsham but are exceptional east of Brighton. The light diesel mixed traffic locomotive No. 10800 continues to be an uncertain and indifferent performer on Oxted line passenger duty. |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1904 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1277 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
05/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31277 |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31277 |
|
|