Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 463 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2950 Week
» 15463 Month
» 103655 Year
» 988036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1280   02/1908
BR 31280   10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 02/1908
Withdrawal During 07/1963
Scrapping During 12/1963
Service Life 55 yrs, 4 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74D Tonbridge 6w/e 01/04/1957
75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
75A Brighton 4w/e 24/11/1960
75A Brighton 7w/e 23/08/1961
73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon m/e 08/12/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74D Tonbridge 9w/e 01/04/1957
ALLOC 75C Norwood Junction 6w/e 05/10/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 73F Ashford Chart Leacon 4w/e 08/12/1961
LOAN DEPT   17/06/1962
ALLOC 75D Stewarts Lane w/e 25/06/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1908 To Service To service as SR Number 1280
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31280    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D)    
05/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
23/08/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31280    

prev prev