Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1287   05/1908
BR 31287   10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 05/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 08/10/1960
Scrapping During 11/1960
Service Life 52 yrs, 5 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951
73C Hither Green 6w/e 01/04/1957
   Withdrawn w/e 08/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 9w/e 01/04/1957
WDN   w/e 08/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1908 To Service To service as SR Number 1287
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31287    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31287    

prev prev