Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 131 Today
» 869 Yesterday
» 131 Week
» 18253 Month
» 187025 Year
» 1071406 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1294 m/e 06/1908
BR 31294 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal During 10/1955
Scrapping During 10/1955
Service Life 47 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 9w/e 01/06/1948
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 22/04/1950
WDN   w/e 24/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as SR Number 1294
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31294    
10/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 31294    

prev prev