Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 303 Today
» 815 Yesterday
» 303 Week
» 16282 Month
» 211736 Year
» 1096117 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1297 m/e 06/1908
BR 31297 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer H. Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/09/1959
Scrapping During 09/1959
Service Life 51 yrs, 3 mths , 12 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BA Bricklayers Arms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
74B Ramsgate 5w/e 14/02/1953
73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 27/03/1953
73D Gillingham (Kent) 9w/e 12/06/1957
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 12/09/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74B Ramsgate 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 27/03/1953
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 12/09/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as SR Number 1297
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31297    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ramsgate (74B)    
27/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 31297    

prev prev