Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 463 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2950 Week
» 15463 Month
» 103655 Year
» 988036 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1298   03/1908
BR 31298   12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 03/1908
Withdrawal During 11/1960
Scrapping During 01/1961
Service Life 52 yrs, 8 mths , 2 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HIT Hither Green 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73E Faversham 9w/e 12/06/1957
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73C Hither Green 6w/e 09/02/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RAM Ramsgate 5w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 73E Faversham q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 6w/e 09/02/1960
WDN   w/e 03/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1908 To Service To service as SR Number 1298
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31298    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 31298    

prev prev