Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 376 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18179 Week
» 71195 Month
» 190722 Year
» 3217575 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1323 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
British Railways |
31323 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
P |
Company History |
SECR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1910 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 09/07/1960 |
Service Life |
50 yrs , 9 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1910 |
FOL |
|
Folkestone Junction |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
09/07/1960 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
74C |
Dover Marine |
2w/e |
13/08/1952 |
TOSTORE |
|
|
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
REINS |
74C |
Dover Marine |
6w/e |
18/11/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/07/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1949 |
Industrial notes |
N.C.B. Snowdown Colliery: British Railways 0-6-OT No. 31323 is on loan here, and was seen at work several times at the end of September. Only one of the colliery's two regular 0-6-0ST's was seen, and this was too far off to be identified. |
SLS/194911 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1323 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Folkestone Junction (FOL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31323 |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31323 |
|
|