Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 44 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7785 Week
» 28227 Month
» 365073 Year
» 1586638 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1400 m/e 07/1932
British Railways 31400 m/e 07/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/06/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1932
AFD Ashford on 01/01/1948
73B Bricklayers Arms 5w/e 14/02/1953
74A Ashford 8w/e 20/07/1953
70C Guildford 4w/e 08/07/1960
75A Brighton m/e 08/12/1961
75B Redhill 4w/e 22/07/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 8w/e 03/03/1953
ALLOC 74A Ashford 2w/e 10/06/1953
ALLOC 70C Guildford 5w/e 08/07/1960
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1961
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 22/07/1963
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering works during April included: 1036, 1086, 1256, 1267, 1276, 1400, 1490, 1503, 1512, 1587, 1902, 1908, 2374, 2402, 2435, 2448, 2457, 2460, 2473, 2573, 2580, 2589, 21C123, 21C125, 21C130, 21C132, W.D. 77296 and 78666. W.D. 70853 and 77103 have been turned out painted black with standard S.R. numerals on buffer, cab sides and back of tender. SLS/194706
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
07/09/1963 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: 30073, 30824, 33037, 34006/15/21/33/41/51, 34043 partially cut up, 35014/7/8/25/7, 41316/24, 73049/51, 75069, 76010/28/68, 80015/31/42/82, D3668, D4100, D6536/45, E5007, E6001. Test House: 31834. Scrap Yard: 30510, 30911. Works Yard: 35010, WD601 ex works, 31400, 31846, 34036 damaged front end, 34055 (with smoke-box door from 34043), 35029, 73110 (all waiting works), 30915, 31818, 32338, 32635/61 waiting scrap. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1932 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1400
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31400    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bricklayers Arms (73B)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31400    

prev