Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 3 Online
» 349 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18152 Week
» 71168 Month
» 190695 Year
» 3217548 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1402 |
m/e |
08/1932 |
British Railways |
31402 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 08/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 25/08/1963 |
Service Life |
31 yrs , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 07/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73J |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
10/02/1961 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
4w/e |
08/12/1961 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
25/08/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
09/07/1950 |
Ramblers\' Excursions |
On 9th July 1950, N. No. 31813-assisted by N. No. 31852 from Redhill, where a stop was made to attach-hauled an eleven-coach ramblers' special from Victoria to Forest Row via Three Bridges. On several occasions this year N. and U.1 class 'Moguls' have hauled crowded 11-coach ramblers' trains unaided over the Oxted line to Sheffield Park, Uckfield and Groombridge. The route of the first-named included three miles of 1 in 70 between Lingfield and East Grinstead and time was kept in all cases with gross loads of 375-400 tons. Ramblers' excursions have also been hauled over the Redhill-Shalford section-9 to 11 corridors-by classes L, L.1 and N. (31772, 31756, 31848, 31402). Judging by the pyrotechnic displays, coal consumption was not on the light side, and time was kept only by high downhill speeds on this switchback line. |
SLS/195101 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1402 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31402 |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
08/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
25/08/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31402 |
|
|
07/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|