Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 60 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7801 Week
» 28243 Month
» 365089 Year
» 1586654 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1402 m/e 08/1932
British Railways 31402 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/08/1963
Scrapping During 07/1964
Service Life 31 yrs , 25 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1932
AFD Ashford on 01/01/1948
73J Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
70C Guildford 3w/e 26/05/1961
75A Brighton m/e 08/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 25/08/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1961
WDN   w/e 25/08/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1950 Ramblers\' Excursions On 9th July 1950, N. No. 31813-assisted by N. No. 31852 from Redhill, where a stop was made to attach-hauled an eleven-coach ramblers' special from Victoria to Forest Row via Three Bridges. On several occasions this year N. and U.1 class 'Moguls' have hauled crowded 11-coach ramblers' trains unaided over the Oxted line to Sheffield Park, Uckfield and Groombridge. The route of the first-named included three miles of 1 in 70 between Lingfield and East Grinstead and time was kept in all cases with gross loads of 375-400 tons. Ramblers' excursions have also been hauled over the Redhill-Shalford section-9 to 11 corridors-by classes L, L.1 and N. (31772, 31756, 31848, 31402). Judging by the pyrotechnic displays, coal consumption was not on the light side, and time was kept only by high downhill speeds on this switchback line. SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1932 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1402
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31402    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
25/08/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31402    

prev prev