Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 766 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 766 Week
» 12059 Month
» 276692 Year
» 1498257 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1403 m/e 08/1932
BR 31403 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sun 30/06/1963
Scrapping During 10/1963
Service Life 30 yrs, 10 mths , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1932
AFD Ashford on 01/01/1948
73J Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
70C Guildford 3w/e 26/05/1961
75A Brighton m/e 08/12/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 30/06/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   m/e 30/11/1957
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75A Brighton 4w/e 08/12/1961
WDN   w/e 30/06/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1932 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1403
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31403    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
08/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Brighton (75A)    
30/06/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31403    

prev prev