Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3999 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17405 Week
» 70421 Month
» 189948 Year
» 3216801 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1404 |
m/e |
10/1932 |
British Railways |
31404 |
m/e |
05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Maunsell |
Class |
Mongolipers |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
2-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 10/1932 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 01/12/1963 |
Service Life |
31 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73J |
Tonbridge |
4w/e |
10/02/1961 |
ALLOC |
72B |
Salisbury |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/12/1963 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1932 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1404 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ashford (AFD) |
|
|
05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31404 |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J) |
|
|
26/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Salisbury (72B) |
|
|
16/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
01/12/1963 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31404 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|