Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 24 Online
» 836 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 836 Week
» 12129 Month
» 276762 Year
» 1498327 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1405 m/e 11/1932
BR 31405 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sun 05/06/1966
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 33 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1932
BAT Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948
73J Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 3w/e 26/05/1961
75B Redhill 4w/e 22/06/1964
70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 05/06/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BAT Stewarts Lane m/e 30/06/1947
ALLOC AFD Ashford 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 75B Redhill 8w/e 22/06/1964
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 05/06/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/04/1947 Ashford Works During the period (1/3/47 to 3/4/47) the following locos. entered the works: 1064, 1113, 1266, 1273, 1311, 1405, 1477, 1486, 1540, 1589, 1599, 1614, 1633, 1671, 1721, 1737, 1753, 1777, 2168, 2390, 2486, 2519, 2536, 2364, W.D. 70811, 70853, 77103 and 78705. SLS/194705
05/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: s1178, 1245, 1252, 31320, 31401/5, 31509, 31616, 31753/75/85, 31820/6/48, s1825, s1871, 32169, 2487, 32502/4/43, 33005/23/8, 78597. In yard : 1107, 1157, 31502/19/21/32, 1714/30, 31745, 31925, 32402, 2447, 32525, 32523/94, 33039, 90226. For scrap : 1443, 1547, 32301, 32584. Recently ex shops: lined black 31305, 31611, 31766/97, 31822, 32492, 32583.
No. 32553 ('C2x') has left Ashford after general overhaul, with two domes. There are still a number of boilers so fitted which are inter-changed from time to time, though the second dome has served no purpose since the top-feed arrangement with which it was associated by the L. B.& S.C.R. was discontinued in 1930 under Southern auspices. The ranks of the famous 'I.3' tanks are being rapidly depleted since the advent of the new Class 4 MT Tanks.
SLS/195104
28/03/1951 Ashford Works In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1932 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1405
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31405    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/06/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 31405    

prev prev