Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 705 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 705 Week
» 11998 Month
» 276631 Year
» 1498196 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1407 m/e 08/1932
BR 31407 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 08/1932
Withdrawal w/e Sun 07/07/1963
Scrapping During 10/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 6 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 08/1932
EXJ Exmouth Junction on 01/01/1948
74A Ashford 4w/e 05/02/1951
74C Dover Marine 6w/e 21/06/1955
74A Ashford 4w/e 10/10/1955
73J Tonbridge m/e 10/02/1961
71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 07/07/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 74A Ashford 8w/e 05/02/1951
ALLOC 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 74A Ashford 3w/e 10/10/1955
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 07/07/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Ashford Works Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. SLS/194708
13/08/1949 Ashford Works Ex Works: Class 'N' Nos. 31407, 31828/49, Class 'H.1' 31904 and DIE No. 15221. Yard shunting was performed by D/E No. 15220 and 'R.1' No. 31069. DIE Nos. 15222/23 are well forward, also a diesel-mechanical unit-Nos. 15224/25 will complete the current order, though it is believed a further lot are contemplated. The last 'F.1' No. 1231 was still intact and other engines in the yard were Nos. 1039/80, 1128, 1238/57, 31268, 1302/11, 31532, 1575, 31662, 1698, 31759, 31805, 1824/80, 31857/93, 1897, 1906, 31907, 1913/14, 2393, 2401/06/34/56/63/68, 2515/26/40, 33032, 34069. An interesting occupant of the shed was 'Terrier' K. & E.S.R, No. KES3. SLS/194909

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1932 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1407
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31407    
05/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C)    
10/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford (74A)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G)    
07/07/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 31407    

prev prev