Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 833 Today
» 1257 Yesterday
» 833 Week
» 12126 Month
» 276759 Year
» 1498324 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1411 m/e 11/1933
BR 31411 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 11/1933
Withdrawal w/e Sun 24/04/1966
Scrapping During 09/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 32 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 11/1933
BAT Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948
75B Redhill 4w/e 22/07/1963
70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 24/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75B Redhill 4w/e 22/07/1963
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 18/01/1965
WDN   w/e 24/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/01/1951 Ashford Works New diesels, 15226 running trials, 15227 nearly ready; a large diesel complete in the paint shop. Ex shops: lined black 31770, 31800, 32576; unlined 31719, 32412, 90164; slight repairs 31263, 31543, 32167. In shops: 31027, 1279/94, 31321, 31400/11/92, 31712, 1735, 31771, 31827/37/48/53, 31903, 32434 (2 domes), 32488, 32539/83, 33003/32/36, 90678. Waiting shops: 31160/79, 31511, 31736, 31819, 78597, 90226, 90564. On scrap road: 1231, 31597/8, 31604. SLS/195102
12/05/1963 Eastleigh Works (Works Yard) Erecting Shop: D3223, D3721, D6522/34/64, E5005/9, 11229 (to be renumbered D2259), DS680, 30828/42, 31621/39, 31859/62, 34001/10/22/4/5/53/76/95, 34104/7/9, 35003, 41224, 76008/18, 80013, 80138/43. Works Yard: D3044, D3462, D6523, 30545, 31411, 31834, 32104/9, 32635/61, 33004/26, 34096, 80032. Scrap Yard: 30039, 30517/33, 30937, 31891. Test House: 33020. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1933 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1411
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31411    
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (75B)    
18/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 31411    

prev prev