Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 502 Today
» 1249 Yesterday
» 1751 Week
» 22193 Month
» 359039 Year
» 1580604 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1413 m/e 01/1934
British Railways 31413 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1934
Withdrawal w/e Sun 14/06/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 30 yrs, 5 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1934
BAT Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948
73H Dover Marine 6w/e 14/06/1959
71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 14/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 71A Eastleigh 3w/e 26/05/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 14/06/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/03/1951 Ashford Works (In shops) In shops: 1107, 31245 (late s1245), s1274, 31287, 31329, 31413, 31510, 31812/26/62, 31900/23/25, 32372 (new cyls.), 32502 (lined black), s2473 (being renumbered), 32467, 32525/65, 78597, 90226, 33039. In yard: s1178, 1335, 31789 (green), 31897, 33025, 31616, 31848. On shed for works 1174, 31408, 31461, 32486 (and 30793 for ELH). Scrap: 1157, 31160 (partly cut up), 1547, 1730, 31743, 31502, 32402, and being cut up 1443 an 32301. Building Shunting diesel-electric 15228-30 and a main-line diesel 10203. Twenty sets of frames for 4-6-2 to be built at Crewe, also many sets of all-welded side tanks for new B.R. standard 2-6-4T to be built at Brighton. Noted not renumbered: 1041, 1271, 1339, 1379. Ex shops 32523 (1 dome), 31405, 31785 (green), 31521, and lined black 31401 an 31825 (late s1825) SLS/195108
25/02/1962 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D2250, D3042, D3271, D6500/3, 33020, 41324, 76025/9. Erecting Shop: D3471, D5012/4, D6506/7/14/63, E6002, L.S.W.R. 120, 15212, 30045, 30515/42/5, 30781, 30838/43, 30955, 31413, 31795/8, 32636/46, 33039, 34002/11/8/24/66, 35025, 41316/7, 73084, 73119, 76016/63, 80010, 80141/51, 92239. Behind Erecting Shop: 30059, 30475/6, 30692, 30864, 80064. SLS/196204
11/09/1963 Eastleigh MPD (Waiting Works or scrap) Ex Works on 71A-DS238 (ex-30070 named Wainwright), 34030, 34102, 41290/5, 76007, D3719. Waiting Works or scrap on 71A-30065/89, 30199, 30241, 30346/68, 30500/3/11/5/6/9/48/86, 30911/30/6, 31403/13, 31637, 31794, 31810/20/79/80/90/8/9, 31900/3/5/6/10/6/21/3, 32353, 32417, 32557, 33011/21, 34023/35/71/4, 41312, 73054. SLS/196310

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1934 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1413
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31413    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
14/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 31413    

prev prev