Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 70 Today
» 1352 Yesterday
» 7811 Week
» 28253 Month
» 365099 Year
» 1586664 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway (1931) 1414 m/e 01/1934
British Railways 31414 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer R. Maunsell
Class Mongolipers
Company History SR
Wheels 2-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 01/1934
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/11/1962
Scrapping During 02/1963
Service Life 28 yrs, 10 mths , 24 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1934
BAT Stewarts Lane on 01/01/1948
73H Dover Marine 6w/e 14/06/1959
70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
70C Guildford m/e 10/02/1961
   Withdrawn w/e 24/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70B Feltham 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 10/02/1961
WDN   w/e 24/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1947 Brighton Works : No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). SLS/194712

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1934 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 1414
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31414    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover Marine (73H)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
24/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 31414    

prev prev