Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 464 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2951 Week
» 15464 Month
» 103656 Year
» 988037 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1481   04/1904
BR 31481   05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Longhedge Works
To Service During 04/1904
Withdrawal During 11/1961
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 57 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FAV Faversham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 4w/e 12/05/1951
73E Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
73H Dover Marine 4w/e 19/08/1959
70B Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
73C Hither Green 8w/e 17/01/1961
73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
   Withdrawn m/e 11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73E Faversham 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 73H Dover Marine 5w/e 19/08/1959
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 73F Ashford 3w/e 26/05/1961
WDN   w/e 11/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 1481
Built at Longhedge Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31481    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
19/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Dover (73H)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
26/05/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31481    

prev prev