Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 95 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4887 Week
» 14821 Month
» 47210 Year
» 931591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1495   06/1904
BR 31495   05/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1904
Withdrawal During 03/1961
Scrapping During 04/1961
Service Life 56 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
FAV Faversham 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 17/12/1956
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 14/06/1959
WDN   w/e 11/03/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 1495
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV)    
05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 31495    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
03/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31495    

prev prev