Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 8 Online
» 729 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14772 Week
» 79726 Month
» 282390 Year
» 3309243 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1496 |
m/e |
03/1907 |
British Railways |
31496 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
Coppernobs |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
4-4-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 03/1907 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1955 |
Service Life |
48 yrs, 6 mths , 2 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1955 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1907 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1496 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Faversham (FAV) |
|
|
13/11/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
03/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31496 |
|
|
05/02/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
26/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Reading (S.R.) (70E) |
|
|
13/05/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
09/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31496 |
|
|