Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 462 Today
» 828 Yesterday
» 2949 Week
» 15462 Month
» 103654 Year
» 988035 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1498   06/1904
BR 31498   08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 06/1904
Withdrawal During 07/1961
Scrapping During 10/1961
Service Life 57 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73C Hither Green 4w/e 08/02/1954
74E St Leonards 6w/e 25/01/1957
73C Hither Green q/e 06/06/1958
70B Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
   Withdrawn m/e 07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GIL Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 74E St Leonards 5w/e 25/01/1957
ALLOC 73C Hither Green 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 29/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 1498
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31498    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
25/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (74E)    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31498    

prev prev