Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 93 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4885 Week
» 14819 Month
» 47208 Year
» 931589 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1508   07/1904
BR 31508   11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 07/1904
Withdrawal During 09/1957
Scrapping During 10/1957
Service Life 53 yrs, 2 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
BAT Stewarts Lane 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 12/05/1951
73E Faversham 4w/e 08/02/1954
73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 19/03/1954
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC GFD Guildford 4w/e 01/04/1948
ALLOC 73B Bricklayers Arms 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 73E Faversham 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 6w/e 19/03/1954
ALLOC 73D Gillingham (Kent) 4w/e 17/12/1956
WDN   w/e 28/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1904 To Service To service as SR Number 1508
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stewarts Lane (BAT)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31508    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Faversham (73E)    
19/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D)    
09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 31508    

prev prev