Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 4394 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17800 Week
» 70816 Month
» 190343 Year
» 3217196 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1556 |
m/e |
02/1909 |
British Railways |
31556 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
P |
Company History |
SECR/SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 02/1909 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/06/1961 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
BTN |
Brighton |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
Status Date |
17/09/2018 |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
30/09/1950 |
General |
Now that the new 2-6-4 tanks are arriving at Tunbridge Wells West, the Maunsell 0-6-0s of class, 'Q' which had been on the Oxted line passenger jobs have been transferred to other sheds for freight duties. Nos. 42096-42101 had arrived to the beginning of September, and a few more are expected. Others under construction in Brighton Works are 42103-42106, 42066-42069. This method of 'numbering backward' savours of L.M.S. methods, though it is understood that after reaching 42095 the next will be 82010 (but not this year!) It is not unusual to see class '5MT' from the L.M.R. at Brighton, chiefly on Sundays or in mid-week: the shedplates are usually 2A or 1A, e.g., 45020 an 45353, but 45233 with a 26A plate was something rather out of the ordinary on 27th August. Little progress has been made recently with the last of the 4-6-2 to be built at Brighton (No. 34110): precedence is doubtless being given to the class '4' tanks. Only a few 2-8-0 seem to be in traffic round Brighton nowadays, though several are in Brighton shops for heavy repair; 90247, however, is much in evidence with its 4B shedplate, a legacy from its' Shrewsbury days. Several Central Section engines have now had their 75A plates affixed, the earliest noted being 31556, 32505, 32509, 32339, 32424, but the number grows daily. Eastern section engines working in have not had shedplates up to the end of August. Early in September the last active 0-4-2T No. 2252 was regularly on the Horsham auto, leaving Brighton about 4 p.m.; it is feared that this veteran may soon wear out its boiler, and then-goodbye? |
SLS/195010 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1909 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1556 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
12/1935 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Dover Marine (DOV) |
|
|
28/05/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (BTN) |
|
|
03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31556 |
|
|
24/06/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31556 |
|
|