Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 95 Today
» 916 Yesterday
» 4887 Week
» 14821 Month
» 47210 Year
» 931591 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1572   09/1903
BR 31572   11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal During 03/1954
Scrapping During y/e 1954
Service Life 50 yrs, 5 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
HIT Hither Green 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
   Withdrawn m/e 03/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TON Tonbridge 9w/e 01/03/1948
ALLOC GFD Guildford 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 74A Ashford 7w/e 22/04/1950
WDN   w/e 13/02/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 1572
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hither Green (HIT)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 31572    
03/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 31572    

prev prev