Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 4062 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 22973 Week
» 87927 Month
» 290591 Year
» 3317444 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
1573 |
m/e |
09/1903 |
British Railways |
31573 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
H. Wainwright |
Class |
C |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 09/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 18/11/1961 |
Service Life |
58 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1961 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
73C |
Hither Green |
q/e |
08/10/1957 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
5w/e |
08/07/1960 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
18/11/1961 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Ashford Works |
Locos. entering Works during the period 4/5/47 to 31/5/47 included: 1123, 1164, 1309, 1319, 1380, 1384, 1403, 1407, 1508, 1573, 1595, 2408, 2454, 2459, 2480, 2482, 2485, 2491, 2499 and W.D. 78563. |
SLS/194708 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 1573 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 31573 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
18/11/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 31573 |
|
|
12/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|