Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 80 Today
» 806 Yesterday
» 886 Week
» 19207 Month
» 107399 Year
» 991780 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 1573 m/e 09/1903
BR 31573 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Wainwright
Class C
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service During 09/1903
Withdrawal w/e Sat 18/11/1961
Scrapping During 12/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 2 mths , 18 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GIL Gillingham (Kent) 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 12/05/1951
73C Hither Green 7w/e 08/10/1957
70B Feltham 4w/e 08/07/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 18/11/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73C Hither Green q/e 08/10/1957
ALLOC 70B Feltham 5w/e 08/07/1960
WDN   w/e 18/11/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1903 To Service To service as SR Number 1573
Built at Ashford Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gillingham (Kent) (GIL)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 31573    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
08/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
08/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
18/11/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 31573    

prev prev